VA SB1269 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1269

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0067)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance; authorization of drug prescribed for the treatment of a mental disorder. Requires that any provider contract between a carrier and a participating health care provider with prescriptive authority, or its contracting agent, contain provisions that require, when a carrier has previously approved prior authorization for any drug prescribed for the treatment of a mental disorder listed in the most recent edition of the Diagnostic and Statistical Manual of Mental Disorders published by the American Psychiatric Association, no additional prior authorization can be required if (i) the drug is a covered benefit; (ii) the prescription does not exceed the U.S. Food and Drug Administration-labeled dosages; (iii) the prescription has been continuously issued for no fewer than three months; and (iv) the prescriber performs an annual review of the patient to evaluate the drug's continued efficacy, changes in the patient's health status, and potential contraindications. The bill provides that this requirement does not prohibit a carrier from requiring prior authorization for any drug that is not listed on its prescription drug formulary at the time the initial prescription is issued. The bill also requires that such provider contracts contain provisions requiring a carrier to honor a prior authorization issued by the carrier for a drug regardless of whether the drug is removed from the carrier's prescription drug formulary after the initial prescription for that drug is issued. Under the bill, provisions related to provider contracts and prior authorization shall apply to the state insurance health plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; authorization of drug prescribed for the treatment of a mental disorder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0067)
2021-03-11 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 67 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-24 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-24SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021
2021-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-19SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1269ER)
2021-02-19SenateEnrolled
2021-02-16HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16HouseRead third time
2021-02-15HouseRead second time
2021-02-11HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N)
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1269S1
2021-01-28SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103534D-S1
2021-01-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-01-28SenateRead second time
2021-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103534D-S1
2021-01-25SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101311D

Same As/Similar To

SB1269 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
HB2008 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0066)
HB2008 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0066)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823407.15:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1269
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1269+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1269S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1269ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0067+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1269F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1269FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1269FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S02C0026+SB1269
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0148SB1269+SB1269
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0168SB1269+SB1269
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H14V0003+SB1269
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1588+SB1269

Bill Comments 750

feedback