VA SB1265 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Acute psychiatric bed registry; frequency of updating. Requires state facilities, community services boards, behavioral health authorities, and private inpatient psychiatric service providers to update information included in the acute psychiatric bed registry whenever there is a change in bed availability for the facility, board, authority, or provider or, if no change in bed availability has occurred, at least once daily.
Title
Acute psychiatric bed registry; frequency of updating.
Sponsors
Sen. George Barker [D] | Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] | Sen. Emmett Hanger [R] | Sen. Janet Howell [D] |
Sen. Linda Puller [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 34 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Friday, February 27, 2015 | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/20/15 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1265ER) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15102109D-E |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1265E |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102109D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2118 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0116)