VA SB1262 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1262
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Restricted permit; prepayment of fines and costs. Provides that any person who is otherwise eligible to receive a restricted permit to operate a motor vehicle shall not be required to pay in full his fines and costs before being issued such restricted permit.
Title
Restricted permit; prepayment of fines and costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 5-N) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101088D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1262 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote