VA SB1256 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1256
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Membership on Criminal Justice Services Board and Committee on Training; law-enforcement training. Requires the social justice organization represented by a member of the Criminal Justice Services Board and a member of the Committee on Training be engaged in advancing inclusion and human rights. The bill contains a technical amendment to compulsory in-service training for law-enforcement officers.
Title
Criminal Justice Services Board and Committee on Training; membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 5-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100693D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1256 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 1 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |