VA SB1251 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Requires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Manufacture and distribution of switchblade knives. Exempts from the prohibition on selling or possessing switchblade knives the possession of any switchblade knife by a manufacturer or distributor in the course of his employment, or employee thereof in the course of his employment, and the wholesale or retail sale of a switchblade knife by a manufacturer or distributor through which the switchblade knife is shipped to any person outside of the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Switchblade knives; manufacture and distribution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 4-N) (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateRequires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
2019-04-03SenateMotion to pass in enrolled form rejected (20-Y 18-N)
2019-03-21 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1251ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-21SenateTitle replaced 19107204D-H1
2019-02-21SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (25-Y 15-N)
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 42-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House with substitute (57-Y 42-N)
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1251H1
2019-02-20HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19107204D-H1
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 19107204D-H1
2019-02-18HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 4-N)
2019-02-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-21HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-17SenateRead third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N)
2019-01-16SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14SenateReported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 4-N)
2019-01-05SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-05SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102677D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182311(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1251
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1251+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1251H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1251ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0049+SB1251
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0023SB1251+SB1251
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0058SB1251+SB1251
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0152+SB1251
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0373+SB1251
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3143+SB1251
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0932SB1251+SB1251
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1157SB1251+SB1251

Bill Comments

feedback