VA SB1245 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0712)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0712)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Registered nurses; provisional licensure. Allows the Board of Nursing to issue a provisional license to an applicant for licensure as a registered nurse who has met the educational and examination requirements for licensure, in order to allow the applicant to obtain clinical experience. A person practicing under a provisional license shall only practice under the supervision of a licensed registered nurse, in accordance with regulations established by the Board.
Title
Registered nurses; provisional licensure for applicant.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0712) | |
2011-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 712 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-25 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1245ER) | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-21 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-17 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Licensing | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102135D |