VA SB1244 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-06 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-06 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System benefits. Provides for an increase, beginning July 1, 2013, of the monthly retirement allowance payable to any person who retired with at least 15 years of creditable service before January 1, 1990, under the Virginia Retirement System or the State Police Officers' Retirement System (or predecessor retirement systems).
Title
Virginia Retirement System, etc.; retirement allowance for certain retired persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 13103675D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+SB1244 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+SB1244+hil |