VA SB1243 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Barrier crimes; listing of crimes. Clarifies the individual crimes included in the various barrier crime statutes.
Title
Barrier crimes; listing of crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | Senate: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Rereferred to Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Assigned Rehab sub: Social Services | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100875D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 2 | 314 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 408.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1719 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1726 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |