VA SB1236 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0176)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0176)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clean fuel vehicle and advanced cellulosic biofuels job creation tax credit; sunset date. Extends the sunset date of the tax credit from the 2011 taxable year to the 2014 taxable year.
Title
Income tax, state; clean fuel vehicle job creation tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0176) | |
2011-03-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 176 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1236ER) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2011-02-16 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-16 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-14 | House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #3 | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #3 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1236S1 | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104644D-S1 | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Incorporates SB1404 | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104644D-S1 | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102884D |