VA SB1235 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Possession or distribution of marijuana for medical purposes; epilepsy. Provides an affirmative defense in a prosecution for the possession of marijuana if the marijuana is in the form of cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil possessed pursuant to a valid written certification issued by a practitioner of medicine or osteopathy licensed by the Board of Medicine for purposes of treating or alleviating a patient's symptoms of intractable epilepsy. The bill provides that a practitioner shall not be prosecuted for distribution of marijuana under the circumstances outlined in the bill. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabidiol oil and THC-A oil; recommendation and dispensing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (92-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-26 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
2015-02-26 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 8 (effective 2/26/15)
2015-02-23 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
2015-02-23SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15
2015-02-20SenateSigned by President
2015-02-17HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-02-17SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1235ER)
2015-02-17SenateEnrolled
2015-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (92-Y 1-N 1-A)
2015-02-13HousePassed House (92-Y 1-N 1-A)
2015-02-13HouseRead third time
2015-02-12HouseRead second time
2015-02-11HouseReported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N)
2015-02-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2015-02-09HouseRead first time
2015-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
2015-02-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 15104765D-ES3
2015-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute with amendment SB1235ES3
2015-02-04SenateEmergency clause added
2015-02-04SenateAmendment by Senator McDougle agreed to
2015-02-04SenateReading of amendment waived
2015-02-04SenatePassed by temporarily
2015-02-04SenateAmendment by Senator Marsden rejected
2015-02-04SenateReading of amendment waived
2015-02-04SenateSubstitute by Senator McDougle agreed to 15104765D-S3
2015-02-04SenateFloor substitute printed 15104765D-S3 (McDougle)
2015-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2015-02-04SenateCommittee substitute rejected15104586D-S2
2015-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2015-02-04SenateCommittee substitute rejected 15104060D-S1
2015-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2015-02-04SenateRead second time
2015-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-02SenateCommittee substitute printed 15104586D-S2
2015-02-02SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 2-N)
2015-01-29SenateRereferred to Courts of Justice
2015-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 15104060D-S1
2015-01-29SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
2015-01-14SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2015-01-14SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101107D

Same As/Similar To

HB1445 (Same As) 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0007)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413472.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5413472.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+SB1235
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB1235+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB1235S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB1235S2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB1235S3+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB1235ES3+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB1235ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+CHAP0008+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S04V0084+SB1235
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S03V0139+SB1235
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0224SB1235+SB1235
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0262SB1235+SB1235
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H08V0301+SB1235
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2327+SB1235

Bill Comments 750

feedback