VA SB1235 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0534)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0534)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charitable organizations; exemptions to reporting requirements. Eliminates the exemption from submitting annual registration statements that was extended to certain veterans' posts and organizations during the 2010 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Charitable organizations; exemptions to reporting requirements for certain veterans' posts, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0534) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 534 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1235ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-17 | House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101557D |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Charitable, Civic and Volunteer Institutions, and Organizations
Religious and Charitable Matters; Cemeteries
Charitable, Civic and Volunteer Institutions, and Organizations
Religious and Charitable Matters; Cemeteries