VA SB1229 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1229
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0276)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0276)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates; DUCKS UNLIMITED. Authorizes the existing special license plates for supporters of Ducks Unlimited to become revenue-sharing special license plates. From each fee collected from registrations over 1,000, $15 shall be deposited into a special account to be paid annually to Ducks Unlimited, Inc., to support its wetlands and waterfowl habitat programs in Virginia. Special license plates; DUCKS UNLIMITED. Authorizes the existing special license plates for supporters of Ducks Unlimited to become revenue-sharing special license plates. From each fee collected from registrations over 1,000, $15 shall be deposited into a special account to be paid annually to Ducks Unlimited, Inc., to support its wetlands and waterfowl habitat programs in Virginia.
Title
License plates, special; issuance for supporters of Ducks Unlimited, fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0276) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 276 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1229ER) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-23 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1229S1 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103254D-S1 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103254D-S1 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100299D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1229 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote