VA SB1227 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0032)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0032)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Telemedicine services; prescriptions. Amends the definition of telemedicine services to encompass the use of electronic technology or media, including interactive audio or video, for the purpose of diagnosing or treating a patient or consulting with other health care providers regarding a patient's diagnosis or treatment. The measure also provides that for the purpose of prescribing a Schedule VI controlled substance to a patient via telemedicine services, a prescriber may establish a bona fide practitioner-patient relationship by an examination through face-to-face interactive, two-way, real-time communications services or store-and-forward technologies when certain conditions are met.
Title
Telemedicine services; provision of health care services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0032) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 32 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Friday, February 27, 2015 | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/20/15 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1227ER) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1227S1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104382D-S1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104382D-S1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103367D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2063 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3418.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |