VA SB1227 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0532)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0532)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Jails; electronic visitation and messaging. Allows sheriffs and jail superintendents who operate correctional facilities to charge a fee for the use of an electronic visitation system or electronic messaging system. The fee may not exceed the actual costs of establishing and operating the system and the proceeds are to be used only to offset those costs.
Title
Electronic visitation and messaging with prisoners; sheriffs, etc., to charge fee for use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 0-N) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 0-N) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0532) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 532 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1227ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-18 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #2 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11101467D-E | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1227E | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Assigned Rehab sub: Corrections | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101467D |