VA SB1209 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1209
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liability of general contractor for wages of subcontractor's employees. Provides that in an action against a general contractor for nonpayment of wages to a subcontractor's employees, the general contract may offer as evidence a written certification that (i) the subcontractor and each of his sub-subcontractors has paid all employees all wages due for the period during which the wages are claimed for the work performed on the project and (ii) to the subcontractor's knowledge all sub-subcontractors have also paid their employees. The bill also provides that the terms "general contractor" and "subcontractor" shall not include persons solely furnishing materials for the purposes of the liability of a contractor for wages due to a subcontractor's employees. Liability of general contractor for wages of subcontractor's employees. Provides that in an action against a general contractor for nonpayment of wages to a subcontractor's employees, the general contract may offer as evidence a written certification that (i) the subcontractor and each of his sub-subcontractors has paid all employees all wages due for the period during which the wages are claimed for the work performed on the project and (ii) to the subcontractor's knowledge all sub-subcontractors have also paid their employees. The bill also provides that the terms "general contractor" and "subcontractor" shall not include persons solely furnishing materials for the purposes of the liability of a contractor for wages due to a subcontractor's employees.
Title
Subcontractor's employees; liability of general contractor for wages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (46-Y 43-N 2-A) (Y: 46 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (16-Y 73-N 2-A) (Y: 16 N: 73 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 13-N) (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (16-Y 73-N 2-A) (Y: 16 N: 73 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 13-N) (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511) | |
2021-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 511 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1209ER) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage #2 (46-Y 43-N 2-A) |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed House (46-Y 43-N 2-A) |
2021-02-24 | House | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House |
2021-02-24 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (16-Y 73-N 2-A) |
2021-02-24 | House | Defeated by House (16-Y 73-N 2-A) |
2021-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (24-Y 13-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21100936D-E |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1209E |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with amendment (11-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100936D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1209 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote