VA SB1209 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Liability of general contractor for wages of subcontractor's employees. Provides that there is a valid defense to a claim of nonpayment of wages by a general contractor to a subcontractor's employees if the general contractor obtains a written certification that (i) the subcontractor and each of his sub-subcontractors has paid all employees all wages due for the period during which the wages are claimed for the work performed on the project and (ii) to the subcontractor's knowledge all sub-subcontractors have also paid their employees. The bill also provides that the terms "general contractor" and "subcontractor" shall not include persons solely furnishing materials for the purposes of the liability of a contractor for wages due to a subcontractor's employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Subcontractor's employees; liability of general contractor for wages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 13-N) (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenatePassed Senate (24-Y 13-N)
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenatePrinted as engrossed 21100936D-E
2021-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1209E
2021-02-05SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-02-05SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-02-05SenateRead second time
2021-02-04SenateRead first time
2021-02-03SenateReported from Judiciary with amendment (11-Y 4-N)
2021-01-27SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100936D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback