VA SB1206 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0647)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0647)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic impact analysis. Removes the requirement that a supplemental traffic analysis accompany a plat or plan submitted to the Department of Transportation by a locality because the plat or plan substantially affects transportation on state-controlled highways if such plat or plan is permissible by right under the local zoning ordinance.
Title
Traffic impact analysis; removes certain requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0647) | |
2011-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 647 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1206ER) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-17 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Passed House (95-Y 3-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-16 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-15 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-15 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-14 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-11 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1206S1 | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104638D-S1 | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104638D-S1 | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103634D |