VA SB1205 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0645)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal street gang predicate offenses. Expands the definition of a predicate criminal act associated with gang activity to include the following crimes: murder, aggravated malicious wounding, reckless endangerment by throwing objects, strangulation of another, possession of infectious biological substances or radiological agents, burglary, entering dwelling house, etc., with intent to commit murder, rape, robbery or arson, grand larceny, receipt of a stolen firearm, manufacturing, distributing, etc., or possessing with intent to manufacture or distribute methamphetamine, discharging firearms or missiles within or at building or dwelling house, use of machine gun for crime of violence, possession or use of "sawed-off" shotgun or rifle, possession of firearm by felon, possession of firearms by persons not legally present, possession of firearms while in possession of controlled substances, felony stalking, felony distribution, etc., of synthetic cannabinoids, a felony violation of manufacture, etc., of controlled substances, felony violation of distribution or possession with intent to distribute marijuana, conspiracy to commit a felony violation of manufacture, etc., of controlled substances, conspiracy to commit a felony violation of distribution or possession with intent to distribute marijuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal street gang predicate offenses; penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N) (Y: 2 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-20 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0645)
2013-03-20 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 645 (effective 7/1/13)
2013-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-03-04SenateSigned by President
2013-03-04SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1205ER)
2013-03-04SenateEnrolled
2013-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N)
2013-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (99-Y 1-N)
2013-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2013-02-21HouseDelegates: Albo, Bell, R.B., Herring
2013-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2013-02-21SenateSenators: McDougle, Reeves, Stanley
2013-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2013-02-21SenateSenate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
2013-02-21HouseHouse requested conference committee
2013-02-21HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2013-02-21SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N)
2013-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2013-02-20HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2013-02-20HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1205H1
2013-02-20HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 13105254D-H1
2013-02-20HouseRead third time
2013-02-19HouseRead second time
2013-02-15HouseCommittee substitute printed 13105254D-H1
2013-02-15HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2013-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
2013-02-12HouseAssigned App. sub: Public Safety
2013-02-11HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2013-02-11HouseReported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N)
2013-02-08HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2013-02-08HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2013-02-06HouseAssigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
2013-02-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2013-02-06HouseRead first time
2013-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2013-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2013-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1205S1
2013-01-31SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 13104692D-S1
2013-01-31SenateReading of substitute waived
2013-01-31SenateRead second time
2013-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2013-01-29SenateReported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2013-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 13104692D-S1
2013-01-23SenateRereferred to Finance
2013-01-23SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N)
2013-01-09SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2013-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101636D

Same As/Similar To

HB1847 (Same As) 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18246.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+SB1205
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+SB1205+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+SB1205S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+SB1205H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+SB1205ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+CHAP0645+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+S03V0104+SB1205
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+S05V0147+SB1205
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0222SB1205+SB1205
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0264SB1205+SB1205
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H0801V0100+SB1205
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H08V0333+SB1205
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H0208V0037+SB1205
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H02V0168+SB1205
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV1147+SB1205
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0789SB1205+SB1205
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0855SB1205+SB1205
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0923SB1205+SB1205
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV1293+SB1205
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV1294+SB1205

Bill Comments 750

feedback