VA HB1847 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal street gang predicate offenses. Expands the definition of a predicate criminal act associated with gang activity to include the following crimes: murder, aggravated malicious wounding, reckless endangerment by throwing objects, strangulation of another, possession of infectious biological substances or radiological agents, burglary, entering dwelling house, etc., with intent to commit murder, rape, robbery or arson, grand larceny, receipt of a stolen firearm, manufacturing, distributing, etc., or possessing with intent to manufacture or distribute methamphetamine, discharging firearms or missiles within or at building or dwelling house, use of machine gun for crime of violence, possession or use of "sawed-off" shotgun or rifle, possession of firearm by felon, possession of firearms by persons not legally present, possession of firearms while in possession of controlled substances, felony stalking, felony distribution, etc., of synthetic cannabinoids, a felony violation of manufacture, etc., of controlled substances, felony violation of distribution or possession with intent to distribute marijuana, conspiracy to commit a felony violation of manufacture, etc., of controlled substances, conspiracy to commit a felony violation of distribution or possession with intent to distribute marijuana.
Title
Criminal street gang predicate offenses; penalties.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 573 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1847ER) |
2013-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2013-02-23 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Delegates: Albo, Bell, R.B., Herring |
2013-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Stuart, Garrett, Marsh |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2013-02-21 | House | House acceded to request |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 13105091D-S1 (0-Y 98-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed by for the day |
2013-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1847S1 |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13105091D-S1 |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13105091D-S1 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1847H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104514D-H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104514D-H1 |
2013-01-25 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101637D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1205 (Same As) 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0645)