VA SB1204 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0173)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0173)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cash proffers; court costs. Allows for an award of fees, expenses, and court costs to a party who successfully contests an action in conflict with the provisions of §15.2-2303.1:1. The sunset provision on this legislation is extended from July 1, 2014, to July 1, 2015.
Title
Cash proffers; allows an award of fees, etc., to prevailing party when contesting certain actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 18-N) (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 18-N) (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0173) | |
2011-03-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 173 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1204ER) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 18-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Passed House with amendment (79-Y 18-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2011-02-16 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-16 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-15 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-14 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-11 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (19-Y 3-N) | |
2011-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11103350D-E | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1204E | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Obenshain agreed to | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103350D |