VA SB1203 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0184)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0184)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Chesapeake Bay Watershed Implementation Plan. Directs state agencies to remove the Little Creek watershed from inclusion in the James River Basin for purposes of the Chesapeake Bay Watershed Implementation Plan.
Title
Chesapeake Bay Watershed Implementation Plan; Little Creek watershed removed from James River Basin.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0184) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 184 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1203ER) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2015-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Chesapeake |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101736D |