VA SB1195 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0445)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0445)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School-based health centers joint task force; report. Directs the Virginia's Children's Cabinet to establish a school-based health centers joint task force that is tasked with (i) assessing the current landscape of school-based services and mental health screening, evaluation, and treatment in school settings; (ii) in coordination with ongoing behavioral health transformation efforts of the Department of Medical Assistance Services and the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, developing best practice recommendations for trauma-informed school-based health centers as a vehicle for the provision of both medical and behavioral health delivered in school settings; (iii) evaluating options for billing public and private insurance for school-based health services; and (iv) developing a plan for establishing a Virginia affiliate member organization, recognized by the national School-Based Health Alliance, for the purposes of providing technical assistance and guidance to localities interested in bolstering or implementing current and future school-based health centers. The bill requires that the task force report its findings by December 1, 2019.
Title
School-based health centers; Va's Children's Cabinet shall establish joint task force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0445) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 445 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1195ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House (91-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1195S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105329D-S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105329D-S1 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102896D |