VA SB1195 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0574)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0574)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Produce safety; farm inspections; civil penalty. Prohibits certain farms from violating the federal regulations that set minimum standards for the safe growing, harvesting, packing, and holding of fruits and vegetables. The bill authorizes the Board of Agriculture and Consumer Services to adopt regulations to carry out the purposes of the law and gives the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services free access at reasonable hours to certain farms to inspect the farms and take samples. The Commissioner also is authorized to seize certain produce if he believes it is being grown, kept, or exposed for sale or held in violation of federal regulations or state law, and the bill provides a court process by which the seizure may be contested. The bill authorizes the Board to levy a civil penalty of up to $1,000 per violation, to be deposited in the Virginia Natural Resources Commitment Fund. The bill includes provisions that would cause it to expire upon the repeal of the relevant federal law, the granting of an exemption under such federal law, or the cessation of federal funding.
Title
Produce safety; farm inspections, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 26-N) (Y: 73 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 26-N) (Y: 73 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0574) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 574 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1195ER) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (25-Y 14-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Title replaced 17105502D-H1 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (28-Y 12-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 26-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed House with substitute (73-Y 26-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1195H1 |
2017-02-17 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105502D-H1 |
2017-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-15 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105502D-H1 |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1195S1 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104861D-S1 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104861D-S1 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101491D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5146 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5153 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |