VA SB1180 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Pretrial deposition of a witness in a criminal trial. Creates a mechanism for the taking of a pretrial deposition of a witness in a criminal trial who has been shown to the satisfaction of the court to be likely to be unavailable for trial because of impending death.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pretrial deposition; creates a mechanism of a witness who is unavailable because of sickness, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-22 House: Left in Courts of Justice
2011-02-18 House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N)
2011-02-16 House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2011-02-10 House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
2011-02-09 House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2011-02-09 House: Read first time
2011-02-09 House: Placed on Calendar
2011-02-08 Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
2011-02-07 Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1180S1
2011-02-07 Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104944D-S1
2011-02-07 Senate: Reading of substitute waived
2011-02-07 Senate: Read second time
2011-02-04 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2011-02-02 Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104944D-S1
2011-02-02 Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
2011-01-13 Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
2011-01-12 Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2011-01-12 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102796D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192268.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback