VA SB1178 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1178
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Genetic counseling; conscience clause. Repeals the conscience clause for genetic counselors who forgo participating in counseling that conflicts with their deeply held moral or religious beliefs, provided that they inform the patient and offer to direct the patient to the online directory of licensed genetic counselors maintained by the Board of Medicine. The law being repealed also prohibits the licensing of any genetic counselor from being contingent upon participating in such counseling.
Title
Genetic counseling; repeals conscience clause.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 14-N) (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 14-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101267D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1178 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote