VA SB117 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Biennial appropriation act. Provides that the Commonwealth's biennial appropriations shall start on July 1 of odd-numbered years beginning with the biennial appropriation act for the period July 1, 2015, through June 30, 2017. The bill would require that the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2014, would not be a part of any biennial appropriation act (i.e., it would be a single-year transitional budget).
Title
Biennial appropriation act; shall start on July 1 of odd-numbered years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100735D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1322 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1402.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 2202.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 2212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 2213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 309.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1503.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2629 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 18.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 23.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1503.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 145 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 82.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 1118 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4421 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1011 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04: | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 167 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 172 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |