VA SB1168 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0644)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0644)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Detention of juvenile for violation of conditions of release. Provides that a juvenile taken into custody whose case is considered by a judge, intake officer or magistrate, who, following his release upon a Class 1 misdemeanor charge or a felony charge "under such conditions as may be imposed" by the judge, intake officer or magistrate and who then fails to adhere to the conditions of the court, intake officer or magistrate while on conditional release may be detained in a secure facility, pursuant to a detention order or warrant, upon a finding by the judge, intake officer, or magistrate. This is to clarify that a juvenile may be detained for violation of such conditions.
Title
Juvenile; may be detained in secure facility for violation if fail to adhere to conditions of court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0644) | |
2011-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 644 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1168ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2011-02-24 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-24 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-23 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11103309D-E | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1168E | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-13 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103309D |