VA SB116 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Annual retail sales and use tax holiday. Establishes an annual retail sales and use tax holiday that takes place on the first full weekend in August beginning on July 1, 2025, through July 1, 2030. During such weekend, state retail sales and use tax will not apply to certain (i) school supplies, (ii) clothing and footwear, (iii) qualified products designated as Energy Star or WaterSense, (iv) portable generators, or (v) hurricane preparedness equipment.
Title
Retail sales and use tax holiday; establishes an annual tax holiday that takes place in August.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 663 (effective 7/1/25) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB116ER) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-06 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-05 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2024-02-28 | House | Delegates: Reid, Watts, Kent |
2024-02-28 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senators: Lucas, Locke, Reeves |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | House | House requested conference committee |
2024-02-22 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2024-02-21 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2024-02-19 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB116H1 |
2024-02-19 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107710D-H1 |
2024-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107710D-H1 |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB116S1 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24105206D-S1 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Incorporates SB64 (Durant) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Incorporates SB58 (Craig) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24105206D-S1 |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101315D |
Same As/Similar To
HB25 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
HB138 (Similar To) 2024-01-17 - Stricken from docket by Finance (21-Y 0-N)
SB58 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
SB64 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
HB138 (Similar To) 2024-01-17 - Stricken from docket by Finance (21-Y 0-N)
SB58 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
SB64 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations