VA SB1157 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0093)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0093)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Condominium Act and Property Owners' Association Act; notice of sale under deed of trust. Clarifies that the required notice of a sale under a deed of trust applies to individual residential lots located in a development subject to the Property Owners' Association Act. The bill also provides that upon receipt of such notice, the governing body of a unit owners' association or of a property owners' association, on behalf of the association, shall exercise whatever due diligence it deems necessary with respect to the unit or lot subject to such sale to protect the interests of the association. In addition, the bill (i) amends the definition of "unit owner" in the Virginia Condominium Act to include any purchaser of a condominium unit at a foreclosure sale, regardless of whether the deed is recorded in the land records where the unit is located, and (ii) adds a definition of "lot owner" in the Virginia Property Owners' Association Act.
Title
Condominium Act and Property Owners' Association Act; notice of sale under deed of trust.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0093) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 93 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1157ER) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1157S1 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104610D-S1 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104610D-S1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101710D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2080 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0410)