VA SB1156 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0708)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0708)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Exemption from jury service; general registrar, electoral board, and their employees. Provides that any general registrar, local electoral board member, or person appointed or employed by a general registrar or local electoral board, except officers of election, shall be exempt from jury service upon his request. This exemption applies only to jury service starting (i) during the period beginning 90 days before any election and continuing through election day; (ii) during the period to ascertain the results of the election and continuing for 10 days after the local electoral board certifies the results of the election or the State Board of Elections certifies the results of the election; or (iii) during the period of an election recount or contested election. Any officer of election shall be exempt from jury service upon his request only on the day of the election and during the period to ascertain the results of an election or the period of an election recount or contested election.
Title
General registrar, electoral board, and their employees; exemption from jury service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0708) | |
2011-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 708 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1156ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Title replaced 11105470D-H1 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1156H1 | |
2011-02-24 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105470D-H1 | |
2011-02-24 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-23 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105470D-H1 | |
2011-02-21 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2011-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-13 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103538D |