VA SB1154 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic infractions not encompassed by reckless or improper driving. Requires the driver of a motor vehicle to (i) give full time and attention to the safe operation of the motor vehicle and (ii) exercise due care and decrease speed as necessary to avoid a collision with any person, vehicle, or other conveyance on or entering the highway. These violations, which are not encompassed by the current reckless driving statute, shall constitute traffic infractions.
Title
Traffic infractions; not encompassed by reckless or improper driving.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Transportation |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (9-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (11-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101562D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 816.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 816.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |