VA SB1147 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1147

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0238)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Nurse Loan Repayment Program; certified nurse aide. Expands eligibility for the Nurse Loan Repayment Program to include certified nurse aides who meet criteria determined by the State Board of Health. Under current law, only licensed practical nurses and registered nurses are eligible for the Nurse Loan Repayment Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nurse Loan Repayment Program; expands eligibility for Program to include certified nurse aides.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0238)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 238 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-24 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-24SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021
2021-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-19SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1147ER)
2021-02-19SenateEnrolled
2021-02-16HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16HousePassed by temporarily
2021-02-16HouseRead third time
2021-02-15HouseRead second time
2021-02-11HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2021-01-14SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-14SenateReported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101017D

Same As/Similar To

SB1147 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321122.6:04(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1147
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1147+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1147ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0238+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1147F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1147FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0017+SB1147
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05C0050+SB1147
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0148SB1147+SB1147
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0174SB1147+SB1147
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H12V0010+SB1147
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1598+SB1147

Bill Comments 750

feedback