VA SB1147 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Nurse Loan Repayment Program; certified nurse aide. Expands eligibility for the Nurse Loan Repayment Program to include certified nurse aides who meet criteria determined by the State Board of Health. Under current law, only licensed practical nurses and registered nurses are eligible for the Nurse Loan Repayment Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nurse Loan Repayment Program; certified nurse aide.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2021-01-14SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-14SenateReported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101017D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321122.6:04(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback