VA SB1143 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0365)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0365)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Oyster ground lease; certain dredging projects. Provides that certain oyster ground leaseholders in the Lynnhaven River are subject to the conduct of approved municipal dredging projects to restore existing navigation channels. The bill limits such projects to oyster grounds that are condemned, restricted, or otherwise nonproductive, and it requires the locality to compensate the lessee for the use of the ground. The bill directs that if the parties cannot agree on a compensation amount, a court of competent jurisdiction shall determine the value of the ground. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2019. This bill is identical to HB 1796.
Title
Oyster grounds; dredging projects in Lynnhaven River.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0365) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 365 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/17 |
2017-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1143ER) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1143S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104818D-S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104818D-S1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101559D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Fisheries and Habitat of the Tidal Waters
Lynnhaven River
Marine Products Science and Resources
Oysters and Oyster Planting Grounds
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors
Fisheries and Habitat of the Tidal Waters
Lynnhaven River
Marine Products Science and Resources
Oysters and Oyster Planting Grounds
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors