VA SB1139 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0356)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0356)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Jamestown-Yorktown Foundation. Updates the primary duty of the Jamestown-Yorktown Foundation to conform with the agency's recently updated mission statement. The bill contains technical amendments and repeals an outdated Code section.
Title
Jamestown-Yorktown Foundation; updates powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0356) | |
2011-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 356 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1139ER) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-14 | House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11103761D-E | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1139E | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (16-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: #1 | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103761D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2094 (Same As) 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0345)