VA SB1135 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Inoperable vehicles; James City County. Authorizes James City County to prohibit any person from keeping, unless shielded or screened from view, on any property zoned or used for residential purposes, or on any property zoned for commercial or agricultural purposes, any inoperable motor vehicle, trailer, or semitrailer.
Title
Inoperable vehicles James City County.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-02-03 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102681D |