VA SB1134 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Jobs Investment Program. Moves the administration of the Virginia Jobs Investment Program from the Department of Business Assistance to the Virginia Economic Development Partnership.
Title
VA Jobs Investment Program; moves administration of Program to VA Economic Development Partnership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2013-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2013-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101304D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2237 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2240.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2240.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 435.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 903.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 904.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 284.22 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |