VA SB1123 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1123

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Will contest; presumption of undue influence. Provides that in any case contesting the validity of a decedent's will where a presumption of undue influence arises, the burden of producing evidence and the burden of persuasion as to the factual issue that undue influence was exerted over the testator shall be on the party against whom the presumption operates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Will contest; presumption of undue influence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2021-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
2021-02-11HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-21SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
2021-01-20SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-18SenateReported from Judiciary (13-Y 1-N)
2020-12-22SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-12-22SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101805D

Same As/Similar To

SB1123 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
642454.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback