VA SB1123 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Child care subsidy; license required. Requires licensure for any child day center or family day home, other than those located on federal property and operated or certified by the U.S. Department of Defense, that contracts with the State Department of Social Services or a local department of social services to provide child care services funded by the Child Care and Development Block Grant. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2016.
Title
Child care subsidy; license required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15102477D-E |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1123E |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Barker agreed to |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Childcare |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102477D |