VA SB1122 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0716)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; students exhibiting suicidal tendencies or behavior; notification of student health or counseling center. Requires each public institution of higher education's policies that advise students, faculty, and staff of the proper procedures for identifying and addressing the needs of students exhibiting suicidal tendencies or behavior to require procedures for notifying the institution's student health or counseling center when a student exhibits suicidal tendencies or behavior.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions; student mental health policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 13-N) (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0716)
2015-03-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 716 (effective 7/1/15)
2015-03-10 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
2015-03-10SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
2015-03-07SenateSigned by President
2015-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-03-06SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1122ER)
2015-03-06SenateEnrolled
2015-02-26SenateTitle replaced 15105350D-H1
2015-02-26SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2015-02-25HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
2015-02-25HousePassed House with substitute (97-Y 1-N)
2015-02-25HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1122H1
2015-02-25HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 15105350D-H1
2015-02-25HouseRead third time
2015-02-24HouseRead second time
2015-02-23HouseCommittee substitute printed 15105350D-H1
2015-02-23HouseReported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2015-02-12HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2015-02-12HouseRead first time
2015-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-02-10SenatePrinted as engrossed 15102388D-E
2015-02-10SenatePassed Senate (24-Y 13-N)
2015-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-10SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1122E
2015-02-10SenateAmendment #3 by Senator Barker agreed to
2015-02-10SenateReading of amendment waived
2015-02-10SenateAmendment #1 by Senator Barker withdrawn
2015-02-10SenateRead second time
2015-02-09SenatePassed by for the day
2015-02-09SenatePassed by temporarily
2015-02-09SenateAmendment #2 by Senator Barker withdrawn
2015-02-09SenateReading of amendment waived
2015-02-09SenateRead second time
2015-02-06SenatePassed by for the day
2015-02-05SenatePassed by for the day
2015-02-04SenatePassed by for the day
2015-02-03SenatePassed by for the day
2015-02-02SenatePassed by for the day
2015-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2015-01-29SenateReported from Education and Health (13-Y 2-N)
2015-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2015-01-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102388D

Same As/Similar To

HB1715 (Same As) 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+SB1122
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB1122+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB1122E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB1122H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB1122ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+CHAP0716+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S04V0088+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0178SB1122+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0380SB1122+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0381SB1122+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H09V0189+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2782+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0942SB1122+SB1122

Bill Comments 750

feedback