VA HB1715 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; students exhibiting suicidal tendencies or behavior; notification of student health or counseling center. Requires each public institution of higher education's policies that advise students, faculty, and staff of the proper procedures for identifying and addressing the needs of students exhibiting suicidal tendencies or behavior to require procedures for notifying the institution's student health or counseling center when a student exhibits suicidal tendencies or behavior.
Title
Higher educational institutions; students exhibiting suicidal tendencies or behavior, policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663) | |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 663 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1715ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate substitute with amendments agreed to by House 15105247D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments HB1715S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Barker agreed to |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105247D-S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105247D-S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1715H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104567D-H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104567D-H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102194D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1122 (Same As) 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0716)