VA SB1119 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1119
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Law-enforcement agencies; body-worn camera systems. Creates a special nonreverting fund to be known as the Body-Worn Camera System Fund to assist state or local law-enforcement agencies with the costs of purchasing, operating, and maintaining body-worn camera systems.
Title
Law-enforcement agencies; body-worn camera systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100957D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1119 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote