VA SB1119 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1119
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0335)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0335)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law-enforcement agencies; body-worn camera systems. Creates a special nonreverting fund to be known as the Body-Worn Camera System Fund to assist state or local law-enforcement agencies with the costs of purchasing, operating, and maintaining body-worn camera systems. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2023. Law-enforcement agencies; body-worn camera systems. Creates a special nonreverting fund to be known as the Body-Worn Camera System Fund to assist state or local law-enforcement agencies with the costs of purchasing, operating, and maintaining body-worn camera systems. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2023.
Title
Law-enforcement agencies; body-worn camera systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0335) | |
2021-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 335 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1119ER) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-25 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed House with amendment (97-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2021-02-24 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-22 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100957D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1119 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote