VA SB1117 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0520)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0520)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School counselors; licensure. Requires every person seeking initial licensure or renewal of a license with an endorsement as a school counselor to complete training in the recognition of mental health disorder and behavioral distress, including depression, trauma, violence, youth suicide, and substance abuse.
Title
School counselors; licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0520) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 520 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1117ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-22 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed House (98-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102221D |