VA SB1114 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance (16-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance (16-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Veteran Entrepreneurship Grant Program and Fund. Establishes the Virginia Veteran Entrepreneurship Grant Program and Fund to provide grants to eligible providers of educational, training, or other services to veterans in the areas of starting their own business, purchasing a franchise, or other entrepreneurial endeavors and to assist such service providers in offering resources to veterans for the start-up of new veteran-owned business operations in the Commonwealth. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2019, and provides that if the Program and Fund are not reauthorized by the General Assembly, moneys in the Fund shall revert to the general fund.
Title
Virginia Veteran Entrepreneurship Grant Program and Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101381D |