VA SB1107 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (12-Y 2-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (12-Y 2-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Medical malpractice; limitation on recovery. Eliminates the cap on the recovery in actions against health care providers for medical malpractice where the act or acts of malpractice occurred on or after July 1, 2021.
Title
Medical malpractice; limitation on recovery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (12-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed to LIS only 21103194D-S1 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100841D |