VA SB1106 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Licensure of physical therapists and physical therapist assistants; Physical Therapy Licensure Compact. Authorizes Virginia to become a signatory to the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact. The Compact permits eligible licensed physical therapists and physical therapist assistants to practice in Compact member states, provided they are licensed in at least one member state. In addition, the bill requires each applicant for licensure in the Commonwealth as a physical therapist or physical therapist assistant to submit fingerprints and provide personal descriptive information in order for the Board to receive a state and federal criminal history record report for each applicant. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2020, and directs the Board of Physical Therapy to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.
Title
Physical therapists & physical therapist assistants; licensure, Physical Therapy Licensure Compact.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 300 (effective 1/1/20) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1106ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101635D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3705.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2400.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3484 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3485 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3496 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |