VA SB1104 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1104

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Parole; notice and certification; monthly reports. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall release a prisoner no sooner than 21 business days after the date of notification by the Virginia Parole Board (the Board) to the appropriate attorney for the Commonwealth of the decision to grant parole. The bill authorizes the Board to make such notification electronically and by certified mail; under current law, only certified mail may be used. The bill requires that the monthly reports issued by the Board regarding actions taken on the parole of prisoners (i) be published on the last day of the month and (ii) include the offenses of which prisoners considered for parole were convicted, the jurisdictions in which such offenses were committed, and the amount of time served by such prisoners. However, a prisoner's name shall be included in the report only if the attorney for the Commonwealth and any victims have been notified; otherwise, inclusion in the report is delayed to the following month. The bill requires that when notice is sent to a victim of the victim's right to present evidence to the Board of the impact that the release of a prisoner will have on the victim, such notice shall also be sent to the attorney for the Commonwealth and the director of the victim/witness program of the jurisdiction in which the prisoner's offense occurred.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parole; notice and certification, monthly reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01SenateFailed to pass
2021-03-01SenateNo further action taken
2021-02-24HouseDelegates: Scott, Watts, Bell
2021-02-24HouseConferees appointed by House
2021-02-23SenateSenators: Obenshain, Boysko, Favola
2021-02-23SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2021-02-23SenateSenate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-22HouseHouse requested conference committee
2021-02-22HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2021-02-19SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N)
2021-02-17HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1104H1
2021-02-17HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21200170D-H1
2021-02-17HouseRead third time
2021-02-16HouseRead second time
2021-02-12HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-02-12HouseCommittee substitute printed 21200170D-H1
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-02SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1104S1
2021-02-01SenateAmendment by Senator Morrisey withdrawn
2021-02-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103121D-S1
2021-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-01SenateRead second time
2021-01-29SenatePassed by for the day
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-15SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103121D-S1
2021-01-15SenateIncorporates SB1293 (DeSteph)
2021-01-15SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2020-12-02SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-12-02SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100482D

Same As/Similar To

SB1293 (Similar To)
SB1293 (Similar To)
SB1104 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531136(n/a)See Bill Text
531155(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1104
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1104+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1104S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1104H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1104ASR
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200170D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1104FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1104FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S09C0012+SB1104
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05C0076+SB1104
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0161SB1104+SB1104
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0228SB1104+SB1104
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H08V0017+SB1104
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1621+SB1104
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0185SB1104+SB1104
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0341SB1104+SB1104

Bill Comments 750

feedback