VA SB1096 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pharmacies; access to Prescription Monitoring Program. Provides that the Board of Pharmacy shall include in its regulations a requirement that nothing shall prevent a pharmacist who is eligible to receive information from the Prescription Monitoring Program from requesting and receiving such information. However, no pharmacy shall be required to maintain Internet access to the Prescription Monitoring Program.
Title
Pharmacies; shall have access to Prescription Monitoring Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 610 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1096ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2011-02-21 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-17 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11101867D-E | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1096E | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Care | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101867D |