VA SB109 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-20 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-20 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Offenders under 21 years of age; parole. Provides that any person sentenced to a term of life imprisonment for a single felony offense or multiple felony offenses committed while that person was under 21 years of age and who has served at least 20 years of such sentence and any person who has active sentences that total more than 20 years for a single felony offense or multiple felony offenses committed while that person was under 21 years of age and who has served at least 20 years of such sentences shall be eligible for parole. Under current law, such parole provisions apply only to juvenile offenders.
Title
Offenders under 21 years of age; parole.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Engrossed by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Engrossed by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 7-N) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101929D |